BRISTOL TRUST FOR THE DEAF

Charity Number: 311507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main objectives of the Trust are: (a) to promote the education of deaf children who are resident in the City of Bristol or the neighbouring District, and (b) to benefit deaf persons by making provision for the education of adults and the technical training of persons over 16 years of age

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £6,879
Total expenditure: £7,871

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BRISTOL DISTRICT INSTITUTION FOR DEAF AND DUMB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Leslie Martin Chair
THE CHARITY OF THOMAS BEAMES
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF MARGARET TINDALL
Received: On time
CHRIST CHURCH EXHIBITION FUND
Received: On time
Lesley Ann Alexander Trustee 01 November 2024
THE BRISTOL BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
OLDBURY COURT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days
Councillor Timothy Charles Rippington Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Councillor Joanna Stafford-Townsend Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Councillor Emma Edwards Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
ALDERMAN JACKIE NORMAN Trustee
None on record
COUNCILLOR SUSAN ANN MASON Trustee
THE GORDANO VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ALDERMAN DEREK STEPHEN PICKUP Trustee
HAWKSPRING
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.57k £4.43k £5.14k £5.73k £6.88k
Total expenditure £6.26k £3.69k £5.18k £3.03k £7.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 WELLINGTON WALK
BRISTOL
BS10 5ET
Phone:
01179505631
Website:

andyburrowsblueyonder.co.uk