Trustees HAZELWOOD SCHOOL
Charity number: 312081

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Leslie Heaton | Chair | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Codling | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Nebel | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Campbell | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Price | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Redman | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Bruwer | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Leach | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Hallam Carter-Pegg | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Benedict Allen Howard Figgis | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Julie Coates | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.