Accounts and annual returns THE EMERSON COLLEGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 312101
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 August 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 August 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 13 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 05 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window