Financial history WHITECHAPEL GALLERY

Charity number: 312162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.24m £5.11m £4.50m £4.11m £4.44m
Total expenditure £4.76m £3.94m £4.72m £5.27m £4.96m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £3.80k £3.60k
Income from government grants £53.30k £2.22m £1.74m £24.80k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.16m £4.21m £3.33m £2.95m £3.28m
Income - Other trading activities £524.21k £361.12k £459.01k £443.15k £652.03k
Income - Charitable activities £510.66k £316.44k £702.98k £715.93k £497.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47.33k £23 £120 £2.75k £6.72k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £133.06k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.64m £2.93m £3.66m £4.06m £3.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £689.42k £618.88k £701.32k £790.81k £747.81k
Expenditure - Governance £21.38k £60.48k £31.10k £110.16k £594.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £41.81k £26.56k £43.68k £13.10k £35.41k
Expenditure - Other £428.60k £384.32k £363.38k £420.82k £311.14k