LAMDA LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In addition to five validated degree programmes, LAMDA offers a Foundation Course and a number of Diplomas, semester and short courses for the private market. The work of the Drama School is complemented by that of Examinations, through which LAMDA offers a drama and communications-based syllabus leading to accredited and non-accredited awards in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£17,154,099
Donations and legacies | £809.36k | |
Charitable activities | £15.73m | |
Other trading activities | £95.74k | |
Investments | £63.75k | |
Other | £455.17k |
Total expenditure:
£15,956,965
Raising funds | £207.43k | |
Charitable activities | £15.75m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,867,962 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £207.43k | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.75m | |
Retained for future use | £1.20m |
People

218 Employee(s)
20 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 27 April 1966: Standard registration
- LONDON ACADEMY OF MUSIC & DRAMATIC ART (Working name)
- LONDON ACADEMY OF MUSIC AND DRAMATIC ART (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Nigel Carrington | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Sudarkasa | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof, OBE Frances Corner | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Prof Naren Anthony Barfield | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nese Guner Rosborough | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Richardson | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dame Shirley Anne Teresa Pearce | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Brown | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROPER | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Michelle Janice Daisley | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Protheroe | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rory Michael Kinnear | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Chisha Mutale Reed | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Isabelle Melanie Ferguson | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mohammad Dastbaz | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shamez Alibhai | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Laing-Baker | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sarah Wright | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
LORD THOMAS ORLANDO CHANDOS | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Margaret Hirst | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.99m | £10.47m | £10.92m | £13.41m | £17.15m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.25m | £12.25m | £11.99m | £13.38m | £15.96m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50m | £1.73m | £1.61m | £3.87m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.18m | £801.43k | £802.05k | £1.13m | £809.36k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £333.51k | £249.92k | £0 | £0 | £95.74k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.47m | £8.81m | £10.12m | £12.28m | £15.73m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.28k | £5.84k | £0 | £3.43k | £63.75k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £595.74k | £0 | £0 | £455.17k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £30.00k | £0 | £198.25k | £198.25k | £13.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.54m | £11.70m | £11.99m | £13.14m | £15.75m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £487.71k | £364.30k | £0 | £242.58k | £207.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £146.16k | £86.37k | £25.19k | £195.77k | £135.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £215.98k | £186.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £31.43m | £30.57m | £29.43m | £28.27m | £27.55m | |
|
Long-term investments | £46 | £46 | £46 | £346 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.40m | £1.03m | £2.48m | £3.52m | £4.94m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.98m | £7.54m | £8.91m | £8.78m | £8.27m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 20TH DECEMBER 1940 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06/02/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/02/2015 as amended on 21 Jun 2018 as amended on 24 Oct 2019 as amended on 13 Feb 2020 as amended on 23 Jul 2020 as amended on 18 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY MAINTAINING AND CARRYING ON A CONSERVATOIRE, ACADEMY, COLLEGE, HIGHER EDUCATION INSTITUTION, SCHOOL OR EXAMINATIONS BOARD IN LONDON, WITH BRANCHES IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE WHERE CHILDREN AND STUDENTS MAY RECEIVE A SOUND EDUCATION AND TUITION IN DRAMATIC ART, MUSIC AND ALL ITS BRANCHES, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED TRADES AND SKILLS, EMBRACING BOTH PRACTICE AND THEORY, AND SO FAR AS MAY BE NECESSARY FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSE IN LANGUAGES, AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE GIVING AND HOLDING OF LECTURES, PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS, CLASSES AND MEETINGS FOR THE PURPOSE AFORESAID, AND TO OFFER SCHOLARSHIPS, PRIZES, QUALIFICATIONS, CERTIFICATES AND MEDALS FOR THE PURPOSE AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Linked charities
- 27 April 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
155 TALGARTH ROAD
LONDON
W14 9DA
- Phone:
- 02088340500
- Email:
- enquiries@lamda.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window