BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE ART MUSEUMS OF ISRAEL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The development of the Art Museums of Israel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 19 January 1967: Standard registration
- 20 February 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1171510 BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE ART MUSEUMS OF ISRAEL
- BFAMI (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE ART MUSEUMS OF ISRAEL (Previous name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47m | £1.38m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.84m | £1.16m | £11.97m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £486.05k | £172.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £325.65k | £422.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £361.88k | £435.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £297.49k | £348.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.60m | £745.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £247.27k | £413.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.00k | £16.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.40m | £480.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.85k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 470 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 470 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1948 AMENDED 15/2/1954, 29/1/1979, 12/9/1994 AND 8/10/2014
Charitable objects
1. PURCHASING OR ACCEPTING DONATIONS AND LOANS OF WORKS IN THE VISUAL ARTS, BOOKS, REPRODUCTIONS AND EQUIPMENT FOR PRESENTATION OR LOAN TO THE MUSEUMS. 2. BY COLLECTING AND ACCEPTING MONETARY DONATIONS AND SUBSCRIPTIONS FOR THE PURPOSES AFORESAID. 3. BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF THE FRIENDS SHALL FORM TIME TO TIME CONSIDER APPROPRIATE PARTICULARLY HAVING REGARD TO ANY REQUEST THAT MAY BE RECEIVED FROM THE DIRECTORS THE MUSEUMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window