THE MUSEUMS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in, and to foster and encourage the preservation and better understanding of the material heritage of mankind and the environment for the public benefit by the promotion and development of museums and galleries and encouraging the involvementof the public. To establish and advance professional standards of those employed in museums and galleries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,352,624
Donations and legacies | £345.24k | |
Charitable activities | £1.66m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £276.89k | |
Other | £69.13k |
Total expenditure:
£2,930,703
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.93m | |
Other | £0 |
£36,473 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £103,491 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.93m |
People

21 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
230 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 November 1962: Standard registration
- MUSEUMS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Mckirdy | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kinvara Margaret Jardine Patterson | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Young | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Steiner | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hasina Dabasia | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Dugdale | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Akhtar Suleman | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Heaton | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine McLean | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Rogers | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stella Byrne | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Terwey | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Miller | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.17m | £2.40m | £2.07m | £2.86m | £2.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34m | £1.72m | £2.49m | £2.28m | £2.93m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £633.13k | N/A | £119.68k | £103.49k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £122.56k | £182.66k | £22.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £140.07k | £865.73k | £585.86k | £1.22m | £345.24k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.89m | £1.30m | £1.32m | £1.46m | £1.66m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £141.48k | £127.00k | £133.19k | £184.45k | £276.89k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £112.56k | £32.66k | £0 | £69.13k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.34m | £1.72m | £2.49m | £2.28m | £2.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.95k | £6.08k | £10.78k | £14.86k | £14.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £37.18k | £613.28k | £195.26k | £825.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £129.04k | £2.61m | £67.85k | £92.28k | £89.24k | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.34m | £277.14k | £2.92m | £2.49m | £2.35m | |
|
Other assets | £537.34k | £852.18k | £470.28k | £1.12m | £459.42k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £255.00k | £188.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £832.37k | £517.76k | £596.55k | £655.60k | £590.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/11/1930 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/07/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/03/2011 as amended on 08 Nov 2018 as amended on 12 Nov 2024 as amended on 12 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION AND BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE MATERIAL HERITAGE OF MANKIND AND THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES AND BY ENCOURAGING THE INVOLVEMENT OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THEIR WORK AND TO ESTABLISH, UPHOLD AND ADVANCE THE STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL EDUCATION, QUALIFICATION, TRAINING AND COMPETENCE OF THOSE EMPLOYED IN MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 07 November 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
42
Clerkenwell Close
London
EC1R 0AZ
- Phone:
- 02075667800
- Email:
- info@museumsassociation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window