THE NATIONAL SOCIETY (CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND CHURCH IN WALES) FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION

Charity Number: 313070
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Society shall be the promotion, encouragement and support of education in accordance with the principles of the Church of England, in England and Wales, and in any other part of the world where the Church of England or churches in communion with it may work.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 1966: Standard registration
  • 26 November 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE NATIONAL SOCIETY (Working name)
  • THE NATIONAL SOCIETY (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) FOR PROMOTING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Robert Penn Trustee 14 June 2024
BOTELER EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ROCK OF JOY TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Grahame Davies Trustee 30 May 2024
None on record
Bishop Jonathan Frost Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Canon Rachel Howie Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Rev Mary Stallard Trustee 04 February 2022
None on record
Sonia Thompson Trustee 03 November 2021
Voice 21
Received: On time
CLASSICS FOR ALL
Received: On time
Canon Dr Addy Lazz-Onyenobi Trustee 08 June 2021
MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF MANCHESTER BRANCH)
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL
Recently registered
AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES
Received: 3 days late
MANCHESTER CARERS CENTRE
Received: On time
Jean Noel Ezingeard Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
MARION PLANT Trustee 19 February 2015
None on record
ROSEMARY JANE LYON Trustee 19 February 2015
None on record
REVD CANON PETER BALLARD Trustee 16 June 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.34m £1.45m £1.55m £3.39m £5.78m
Total expenditure £1.80m £1.43m £1.83m £3.99m £5.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1 N/A
Income from government grants £694.87k £556.32k £5.50k £228.95k £3.64m
Income - Donations and legacies £20.73k £138.62k £300.00k £284.58k £729.28k
Income - Other trading activities £597.01k £674.24k £626.97k £1.92m £3.88m
Income - Charitable activities £1.14m £170.05k £135.05k £445.40k £662.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £573.19k £463.86k £483.84k £500.82k £501.70k
Income - Other £11.87k £5.89k £1.31k £233.20k £6.72k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.27m £1.00m £1.31m £2.59m £2.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £45.25k £42.14k £47.20k £45.25k £42.13k
Expenditure - Governance £21.49k £16.35k £11.63k £25.83k £19.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £47.20k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £45.25k £42.14k £47.20k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £481.06k £380.08k £469.96k £1.35m £3.29m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 £1.82m £2.05m £0 £0
Long-term investments £13.97m £11.62m £12.86m £13.12m £13.11m
Other assets £1.95m £1.83m £1.90m £1.43m £2.03m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £518.67k £334.57k £646.83k £876.06k £1.50m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 January 2025 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 January 2025 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
LETTER DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 1960
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE HELP FOR FEMALE STUDENTS, RECOMMENDED BY THE CHURCH UNION, WISHING TO STUDY THEOLOGY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 26 July 1966 : Standard registration
  • 26 November 2012 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
THE NATIONAL SOCIETY
CHURCH HOUSE
GREAT SMITH STREET
LONDON
SW1P 3BL
Phone:
02078981501