Financial history THE ASSOCIATION FOR SCIENCE EDUCATION

Charity number: 313123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.09m £1.10m £1.82m £1.57m £1.48m
Total expenditure £1.19m £1.00m £1.71m £1.57m £1.56m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.69k £32.28k £5.08k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.89k £215.03k £39.74k £3.01k £11.59k
Income - Other trading activities £55.93k £52.51k £75.38k £66.33k £62.43k
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £795.32k £1.70m £1.49m £1.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £472 £20 £150 £3.33k £4.29k
Income - Other £13.69k £32.28k £5.08k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £213.33k £31.92k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £920.64k £1.60m £1.48m £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £50.11k £0 £105.32k £95.28k £87.74k
Expenditure - Governance £47.37k £37.76k £39.06k £41.68k £42.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £28.60k £82.52k £0 £0 £0