LEARNING ON SCREEN - THE BRITISH UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES FILM AND VIDEO COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the advancement of education by promoting the production, study and use of moving image, sound and related media within education and research for the public benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£1,341,730
Donations and legacies | £88 | |
Charitable activities | £1.29m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £17.34k | |
Other | £30.00k |
Total expenditure:
£1,310,396
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.31m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.31m | |
Retained for future use | £31.33k |
People

18 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 1969: Standard registration
- BUFVC (Working name)
- BRITISH UNIVERSITIES FILM AND VIDEO COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JOHN CYRIL PAGET ELLIS | Chair | 16 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Anne Payne | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Feasey | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Violet Maydon | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ailsa Grant Ferguson | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katerina Loukopoulou | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Fenton | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Joseph McAteer | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Kendra | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shane Michael O'Sullivan | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Nathan Berger | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carl Francis Draper | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR CHRIS WILLMOTT | Trustee | 15 December 2008 |
|
|
||||
MR JON SHEARS | Trustee | 14 December 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.03m | £1.13m | £1.16m | £1.20m | £1.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25m | £1.06m | £1.01m | £1.18m | £1.31m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £88 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.02m | £1.13m | £1.16m | £1.20m | £1.29m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.39k | £379 | £475 | £5.61k | £17.34k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £30.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.25m | £1.06m | £1.01m | £1.18m | £1.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.49k | £11.62k | £68.08k | £80.40k | £68.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £8.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £89.22k | £53.15k | £116.73k | £127.09k | £155.47k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £691.09k | £804.73k | £753.88k | £742.36k | £722.11k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £367.18k | £375.10k | £244.49k | £226.06k | £202.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUN 1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAY 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 APR 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE PRODUCTION, STUDY AND USE OF MOVING IMAGE, SOUND AND RELATED MEDIA WITHIN EDUCATION AND RESEARCH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 120
Orega Holborn Gate
330 High Holborn
London
WC1V 7QH
- Phone:
- 020 3743 2389
- Email:
- ask@learningonscreen.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window