THE ANGLO-PORTUGUESE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster the historical and cultural links between Portugal and the United Kingdom through talks, lectures, visits, dinners and other social functions in honour of the Treaty of Windsor 1386 between Portugal and England, the world's oldest treaty of alliance. In addition the Society provides financial assistance to childrens' homes and charities in Portugal on a charitable basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Portugal
Governance
- 08 July 1968: Standard registration
- 20 June 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 29 July 1997: Standard registration
- APS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Carito | Chair | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Mike Malan | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Julian Gallant | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Noel de Keyzer | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Karim Sacoor | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Jason Tiller | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.13k | £17.47k | £31.11k | £9.82k | £8.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.04k | £19.14k | £33.63k | £8.71k | £11.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2022 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 2ND JUNE 1966 AS AMENDED 1979, 12TH JUNE 1985 AND 22ND JUNE 1998. as amended on 29 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM ABOUT PORTUGAL, ITS PEOPLE AND ITS CULTURE. (2) THE RELIEF FROM SUFFERING OF THE PEOPLE OF PORTUGAL AND OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARY SUMNER HOUSE
24 TUFTON STREET
LONDON
SW1P 3RB
- Phone:
- 02033718767
- Email:
- info@apsociety.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window