Trustees OVERLORD EMBROIDERY TRUST
Charity number: 313624

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNTESS CHARLES DE SALIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Russell George Harding | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Lady Amanda Zambellas | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Myles Keeling | Trustee | 22 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Wills | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR GENERAL JAMIE BALFOUR CBE DL | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
HON IAN WILLS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.