Financial history E B M CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.40m £1.40m £1.60m £1.76m £1.83m
Total expenditure £1.78m £1.67m £1.84m £1.99m £2.37m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.40m £1.40m £1.60m £1.76m £1.83m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.50m £1.38m £1.54m £1.70m £2.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £278.49k £291.20k £307.31k £291.96k £315.27k
Expenditure - Governance £132.32k £138.95k £139.11k £145.14k £157.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.37m £1.24m £1.40m £1.56m £1.90m
Expenditure - Investment management £278.49k £291.20k £307.31k £291.96k £315.27k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0