THE JOHN CHARNLEY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the Charity are those of funding research in the field of joint replacement, research fellowships, and lectures, conferences and seminars to further the technique of Low Friction Arthoplasty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 August 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTYN LONSDALE PORTER | Chair |
|
||||||
Richard Parkinson FRCSEdOrth | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Adam Charles Watts MBBS BSc | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Henry Wynn Jones MBChB FRCS | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|||||
JOHN PATTISON HODGKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISTAIR CHARLES ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRISTOPHER FAUX | Trustee |
|
||||||
Tristram Charnley | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £603.78k | £86.84k | £56.63k | £86.35k | £83.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.80k | £82.37k | £103.48k | £116.02k | £145.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £546.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £38.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £18.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £545.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £95.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £47.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £9.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUNE 1983
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR, OR INTO THE RELIEF OF PAIN, SUFFERING AND DISABILITY ARISING OUT OF OR ASSOCIATED WITH JOINTS OF THE HUMAN SKELETON AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF LOW FRICTION ARTHROPLASTY OF THE HIP AND RELATED AREAS OF SURGERY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 EATON AVENUE
MATRIX OFFICE PARK
BUCKSHAW VILLAGE
CHORLEY
LANCASHIRE
PR7 7NA
- Phone:
- 01772299888
- Email:
- mail@mcmillanaccountants.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window