Financial history SPEAR TRUST

Charity number: 326696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £12.38k £40.29k £10.00k £6.33k £8.90k
Total expenditure £360 £5.36k £2.36k £14.36k £16.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A