Accounts and annual returns THE WETHERLAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 27 August 2024 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 August 2024 556 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 August 2024 921 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 July 2024 1250 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required