Financial history THE WETHERLAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 326794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.91k £2.56k £2.73k £2.95k £2.94k
Total expenditure £4.60k £2.63k £952 £1.00k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A