Financial history NER YISROEL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 327078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £647.94k £475.69k £563.13k £560.75k £565.82k
Total expenditure £777.49k £472.73k £488.46k £551.84k £564.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £395.04k N/A £416.55k £374.30k £357.20k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £4.51k £0
Income - Charitable activities £157.71k N/A £60.67k £83.13k £102.90k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £95.20k N/A £85.91k £98.81k £105.72k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £777.49k N/A £488.46k £551.84k £564.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.46k N/A £2.55k £1.54k £1.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £79.37k N/A £34.12k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0