Financial history TALAWA THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 327362
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £608.51k £532.61k £728.45k £735.44k £1.13m
Total expenditure £592.28k £459.58k £714.40k £722.40k £1.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £448.41k £448.41k £454.81k £823.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £571.71k £475.74k £621.84k £653.56k £950.63k
Income - Other trading activities £3.52k £0 £0 £0 £4.64k
Income - Charitable activities £32.50k £2.77k £40.19k £49.62k £179.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £777 £0 £50 £1.85k £0
Income - Other £0 £54.10k £66.37k £30.41k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £592.28k £459.58k £714.40k £722.40k £1.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £81.77k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0