Governing document TALAWA THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 28 JANUARY 1987, 12 APRIL 2005 AND 10 NOVEMBER 2005. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JAN 2018 as amended on 25 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE SINGING AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.