Trustees TALAWA THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Charity number: 327362

Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Rose Banton | Chair | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Danquah | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shonagh Alice Reid | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Kehryse Vanessa Johnson-Fraser | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaniqua Marie Benjamin | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diogo Alexandre Dos Santos Varela | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chante Frazer | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Raymond Turner | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Olivier Pierre-Noel | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
IROGWEHI NIEROS OYEGUN | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Dacre | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.