Financial history BRITISH HYDROLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 327488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £54.61k £40.35k £42.22k £122.30k £49.61k
Total expenditure £43.97k £41.52k £43.43k £105.69k £52.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A