Governing document BRITISH HYDROLOGICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 327488

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 01/12/1985 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/1987 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/2013 as amended on 18 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
IN ACCORDANCE WITH GUIDANCE ON PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE INTEREST AND SCHOLARSHIP IN BOTH THE SCIENTIFIC AND THE APPLIED ASPECTS OF HYDROLOGY AND TO FOSTER THE INVOLVEMENT OF ITS MEMBERS IN INTERNATIONAL ACTIVITIES DIRECTED TO THE PROMOTION OF SUCH SCHOLARSHIP.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.