Financial history SANDRA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £822.25k £723.33k £828.42k £879.06k £1.08m
Total expenditure £1.02m £1.10m £940.45k £1.08m £1.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £200.00k £200.00k £200.00k £200.00k £350.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £622.25k £523.33k £628.42k £679.06k £730.37k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £915.34k £988.78k £817.70k £966.87k £935.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds £107.94k £112.81k £122.75k £117.47k £115.20k
Expenditure - Governance £116.59k £109.64k £111.75k £118.64k £133.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £649.50k £600.50k £562.00k £683.95k £683.89k
Expenditure - Investment management £107.94k £112.81k £122.75k £117.47k £115.20k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0