Financial history THE HUGGARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 327501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.11k £64.58k £33.82k £37.21k £37.14k
Total expenditure £97.28k £157.90k £97.45k £131.59k £180.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A