NMC RECORDINGS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NMC believes that new music is a dynamic and engaging art. We seek to discover and share exceptional work that inspires and challenges. NMC: - produces high quality recordings of outstanding work by British composers - works with leading artists and ensembles - promotes these recordings to expand worldwide audiences for contemporary music - preserves this creativity for generations to come
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £50,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 January 1989: Standard registration
- NEW MUSIC CASSETTES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Wellings | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chris O'Reilly | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emily Granozio | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE SINCLAIR | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE NEWBOULD | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Raj Arumugam | Trustee | 23 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHNS | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER POTTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £327.97k | £361.97k | £358.42k | £321.65k | £256.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.81k | £273.23k | £365.11k | £329.29k | £366.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.00k | N/A | £40.74k | £40.74k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 NOV 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAR 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING THE UNDERSTANDING APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MUSIC OF HIGH ARTISTIC CALIBRE COMPOSED BY LIVING MUSICIANS AND OF SUCH MUSIC GENERALLY. (B) TO MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF WORKS OF HIGH ARTISTIC MERIT IN THE COMMUNITY AND CONTRIBUTE TO THE INCREASE OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE SPHERE OF MUSIC BY ASSISTING IN THE DISSEMINATION OF MERITORIOUS MUSICAL WORKS BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
NMC RECORDINGS LTD
ST MARGARETS HOUSE
21 OLD FORD ROAD
BETHNAL GREEN
LONDON
E2 9PL
- Phone:
- 02030225836
- Email:
- nmc@nmcrec.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window