Financial history FRIENDS OF ASCENT

Charity number: 328625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £92.62k £125.79k £81.83k £121.53k £225.22k
Total expenditure £68.74k £147.37k £77.30k £123.34k £230.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A