Trustees DORSET GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1061378

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellen Hall | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Leonard | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bennett | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Drummond | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Moira Elizabeth Cooney | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|||||
SALLY WOODLEY | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Sharon Gatrell | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Nathan | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Jeram | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Roberts | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sarah Ramsden | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Alice Boyer | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Knight | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kemp | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Claire Fisher | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
ANGELA SUSAN ORTON | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Upward | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.