Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE EAST BERKSHIRE LIMITED
Charity Number: 1065672

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Geoffrey REynolds | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Wray | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Jayne McVie | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tsung Ling Katy Lau | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Stuart Jackman-Clarke | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nitin Suneja | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dimitri Naumenko-Pronin | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tonderai Mugabe | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shabnam Jabine Ali | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Carol Standbridge | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penny Thorpe | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Anne Coppell | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.