Financial history CHRYSALIS (MANCHESTER)

Charity Number: 1065028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.01k £20.31k £10.36k £30.45k £17.75k
Total expenditure £17.69k £24.59k £7.51k £27.05k £27.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.00k
Income from government grants £6.87k £12.91k £6.16k £13.33k £0