MIDLAND AND EASTERN AREA BRANCH OF THE SUFFOLK SHEEP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES EDUCATIONAL AND INDUSTRY RELATED SUPPORT TO SUFFOLK SHEEP BREEDERS AND AGRICULTURE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 February 1998: Standard registration
- MIDLAND AND EASTERN AREA BRANCH SUFFOLK SHEEP SOCIETY (Previous name)
- MIDLAND AND SOUTHERN AREA BRANCH OF THE SUFFOLK SHEEP SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LLOYD JOHN HUGHES | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Charles Walker | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL OAKES | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN JOHN BUCKLEY | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stocking | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Woolway | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
MERRICK JOHN RUSSELL PINNY | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
ANITA GAIL JEFFRIES | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norman Howl | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry Lyons | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin O'Donoghue | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PETER INMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £2.33k | £2.84k | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £330 | £200 | £2.58k | £1.02k | £991 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 1997 as amended on 19 Nov 2003
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE AGRICULTURE BY IMPROVING THE BREED OF SUFFOLK SHEEP. B. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BREED OF SUFFOLK SHEEP AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salters Hill Farm
Thorpe Satchville
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE14 2TB
- Phone:
- 07774635748
- Email:
- dandjinman@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window