Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE OUTREACH TRUST

Charity number: 1062318
Charity reporting is overdue by 1546 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 816 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 816 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1181 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1181 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1546 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1546 days