THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (SOMERSET BRANCH)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
publicising, teaching and demonstrating scottish country dancing in Somerset
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- R S C D S SOMERSET (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2019 | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.15k | £4.49k | £3.10k | £2.08k | £233 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.70k | £3.93k | £2.68k | £1.63k | £462 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING PARTICULARLY BY PRESERVING AND FURTHERING THE PRACTICE OF DANCES, PROVIDING INSTRUCTION AND PROMOTING ENJOYMENT AND APPRECIATION OF THE DANCING
Area of benefit
SOMERSET AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window