MOZART INTERNATIONAL SINGING COMPETITION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial and professional support to young professional singers mainly through holding regular competitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 July 1997: Standard registration
- 16 January 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 16 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1043131 THE DAVID CLOVER FESTIVAL OF SINGING
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.16k | £12.28k | £5.65k | £3.25k | £10.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.03k | £4.30k | £17.16k | £0 | £5.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 December 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF SINGING, IN PARTICULAR BY PRESENTING AN INTERNATIONAL SINGING COMPETITION FOR SINGERS ON A REGULAR BASIS, NORMALLY EVERY YEAR, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window