Financial history FRIENDS OF THE WHITCHURCH SURGERY

Charity number: 1064109
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.51k £6.58k £6.42k £1.80k £220
Total expenditure £5.96k £5.15k £6.48k £3.29k £377
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A