SHEPRETH SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial assistance towards educational projects within the village community, both to individuals and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 May 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugh Wood | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Macleod | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter McDonald | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|||||
JEREMY JOHN SEAMAN HILL | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE SARA PEPPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | £2.65k | £2.69k | £2.78k | £3.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £920 | £1.62k | £2.17k | £3.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 30TH JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR BARRINGTON COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE FROM PUBLIC FUNDS; (B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF SHEPRETH FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (C) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHEPRETH AND ADJOINING PARISHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 High Street
Shepreth
ROYSTON
Hertfordshire
SG8 6PP
- Phone:
- 07944 037130
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window