Financial history THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1062764
Charity reporting is up to date (165 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £702.60k £520.46k £651.47k £1.04m £599.50k
Total expenditure £653.23k £563.95k £676.57k £860.98k £821.51k
Income from government contracts £38.48k £3.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.98k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £72.22k £43.77k £103.86k £145.60k £79.96k
Income - Other trading activities £7.60k £11.67k £11.67k £11.67k £0
Income - Charitable activities £614.53k £456.79k £527.82k £871.35k £510.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.25k £8.23k £8.12k £8.41k £9.22k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £616.48k £529.80k £638.78k £815.52k £754.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.75k £34.15k £37.79k £45.47k £66.01k
Expenditure - Governance £27.59k £30.97k £30.22k £32.17k £15.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.20k