THE VEOLIA ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Veolia Environmental Trust supports community and environmental projects in England that fulfill the objectives set out in the regulations of the Landfill Communities Fund (LCF) regulated by ENTRUST. Applications for funding are received through our website (www.veoliatrust.org) and are assessed by the Board of Trustees on a quarterly basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,015,000
Donations and legacies | £4.01m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,000,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.00m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.00m | |
Retained for future use | £15.00k |
People

5 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- THE ONYX ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ONYX ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST (LIMITED) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Schwaller | Chair | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Katie Harrison | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Poulter | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Junaid Akhtar | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Langabeer | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rituja Rao | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Titchen | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hulland | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luke Bailey | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Dennison | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Demetrius | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donald Macphail | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.82m | £4.78m | £5.43m | £4.34m | £4.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.24m | £4.59m | £5.75m | £5.41m | £4.00m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.71m | £4.72m | £5.43m | £4.34m | £4.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £108.00k | £50.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.00k | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.24m | £4.59m | £5.75m | £5.41m | £4.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £210.00k | £213.00k | £226.03k | £192.00k | £170.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.00k | £6.00k | £6.00k | £2.00k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.65m | £5.12m | £4.31m | £3.15m | £4.21m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.52m | £804.00k | £308.00k | £218.00k | £53.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/06/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 2017 as amended on 05 Jun 2018 as amended on 09 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION, PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONEMTN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS CONCERNING THE ENVIRONEMENT, ITS CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Veolia Environmental Trust
Kingswood House
Kingswood Crescent
CANNOCK
Staffordshire
WS11 8JP
- Phone:
- 02035676820
- Email:
- UK.Trust@veolia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window