Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.MICHAEL, PLAYDEN, EAST SUSSEX

Charity number: 1062992
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required