Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.MICHAEL, PLAYDEN, EAST SUSSEX

Charity number: 1062992
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.54k £3.67k £4.92k £2.12k £2.06k
Total expenditure £29 £30.00k £5.01k £7 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A