Governing document THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.MICHAEL, PLAYDEN, EAST SUSSEX
Charity number: 1062992
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 24 JUN 2017 as amended on 21 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF PLAYDEN CHURCH AND ALL IN THE CURTILAGE THEREOF , AND TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE CHURCH AS A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PLAYDEN AND RYE ,EAST SUSSEX
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.