Financial history Servol Community Services

Charity Number: 1125896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.27m £2.49m £2.72m £2.73m £3.33m
Total expenditure £2.31m £2.34m £2.61m £2.92m £3.36m
Income from government contracts £2.22m £2.37m £1.95m £2.66m £3.28m
Income from government grants £2.35k £86.62k £86.62k £12.74k £31.28k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.22m £2.46m £2.68m £2.70m £3.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £41.46k £34.75k £34.02k £32.02k £25.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.31m £2.34m £2.61m £2.92m £3.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.20k £23.09k £18.57k £11.17k £13.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0