VERSA ORGANISATION LTD

Charity number: 1063666
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Counselling service. Complementary therapies. Weight management training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018

Total income: £99,767
Total expenditure: £180,374

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1997: Standard registration
  • 21 June 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 21 June 2019: Funds transferred to 1176331 AIRE, WHARFE AND CRAVEN COUNSELLING
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • KEIGHLEY WOMEN'S CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
  • KEIGHLEY WOMENS'S CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £2.40k £2.40k £22.40k £62 £99.77k
Total expenditure £73 £2.67k £22.67k £2.67k £180.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required