Financial history FRIENDS OF BOWES SCHOOL

Charity number: 1076355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £17.27k £8.71k £15.07k £1.79k £2.77k
Total expenditure £18.19k £13.64k £8.74k £15.72k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A