Accounts and annual returns WINIFRED WHARTON TRUST

Charity number: 1079695
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 April 2025 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 April 2025 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 February 2025 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 January 2025 341 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 March 2021 55 days late Download Open in new window