Financial history WORTHING PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA LIMITED

Charity number: 1064019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £21.77k £2.87k £24.88k £24.83k £22.11k
Total expenditure £15.54k £2.96k £25.85k £20.76k £32.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A