Financial history MISSION AVIATION FELLOWSHIP UK

Charity number: 1064598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.65m £13.79m £15.97m £14.00m £17.15m
Total expenditure £12.26m £12.60m £17.12m £15.74m £16.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.00k £21.97k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.63m £13.78m £15.91m £13.85m £17.01m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.00k £12.00k £60.00k £146.00k £143.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.91m £4.61m £4.89m £3.76m £5.51m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.15m £10.47m £14.96m £13.13m £13.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.12m £2.12m £2.16m £2.61m £2.84m
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £19.00k £24.00k £29.00k £41.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.50m £5.56m £7.06m £6.33m £5.11m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0