Financial history THE LENCHES SPORTS AND RECREATION CLUB

Charity number: 1068468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.81k £32.06k £33.67k £131.56k £110.58k
Total expenditure £23.51k £26.95k £49.70k £40.92k £38.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.04k £8.00k £19.00k £29.09k