Financial history YMCA TRINITY GROUP

Charity number: 1069810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.39m £10.22m £11.15m £10.87m £12.80m
Total expenditure £10.31m £10.19m £10.76m £11.74m £12.52m
Income from government contracts £251.22k £262.39k £210.31k £1.87m £961.54k
Income from government grants £1.41m £1.03m £1.01m £1.11m £87.44k
Income - Donations and legacies £18.57k £38.20k £64.90k £125.01k £103.66k
Income - Other trading activities £1.29m £322.39k £989.09k £959.57k £1.44m
Income - Charitable activities £8.91m £9.70m £9.59m £9.75m £11.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £165.27k £159.64k £152.87k £29.38k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £352.37k £0 £138.53k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £80.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.12m £9.39m £9.72m £10.50m £11.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.05k £78.90k £78.40k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £129.95k £106.37k £20.52k £0 £55.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.22k £4.79k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.15m £719.64k £965.20k £1.23m £1.44m