BRYNCYNON COMMUNITY REVIVAL STRATEGY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Strategy carries out the following activities Personal development of youth in the Bryncynon area Encouraging participation from all sections of the community to join our Healthy Living agenda Promoting and teaching the benefits of a healthy lifestyle amongest 0-5's and their parents. Providing Playgroup and Out of School clubs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £80,732 from 2 government contract(s) and £20,971 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 19 January 1998: Standard registration
- 22 July 2020: Funds received from 1038678 BLACKWOOD PLAYGROUP (GWENT)
- THE STRATEGY (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Edward Bradwick | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Leslie Stevenson | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen Gould | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.62k | £279.27k | £381.04k | £348.06k | £344.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £320.90k | £296.28k | £269.45k | £361.38k | £420.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £146.25k | £134.07k | N/A | £153.48k | £80.73k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £57.22k | £193.75k | £22.56k | £20.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATIONS INCORPORATED ON 8 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 31 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS AND QUALITY OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS OF BRYNCYNON IN THE RHONDDA CYNON TAFF UNITARY AUTHORITY AREA
Area of benefit
BRYNCYNON , RHONDDA CYNON TAFF
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Feel Good Factory
Bryncynon Healthy Living Centre
Abercynon Road
Abercynon
MOUNTAIN ASH
CF45 4XZ
- Phone:
- 01443475120
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window